|
06/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-170
|
|
|
|
06/07/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (829124)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|