Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022