Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1262 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022