Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Education read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/16/2021 | Filed |