Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/16/2021 | Filed |