Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Education read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/17/2021 | Filed |