Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/04/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/20/2021 | Filed |