Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/20/2021 | Filed |