Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 513
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 513
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|