Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2022