Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Education read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/21/2021 | Filed |