Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/21/2021 | Filed |