Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 921
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 921
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (168508, 917348) 550
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|