Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022