Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Filed |