Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022