Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Education; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Filed |