Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 1119
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted HB 1119
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|