Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Filed |