Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Now in Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | Filed |