Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Filed |