Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1434 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2022