Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Education | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Now in Education | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Filed |