Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022