Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022