LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1480
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1480
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1480
Action History
Senate
03/14/2022
Died in Banking and Insurance
Senate
03/12/2022
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Senate
01/18/2022
Introduced
Senate
01/12/2022
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
Senate
01/05/2022
Filed