|
05/11/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-101
|
|
|
|
05/10/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 625
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|