Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Filed |