|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 80, NAYS 36
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/01/22, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|