Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 389
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 389
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|