Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Filed |