Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | CS by Health Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Filed |