Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 915
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 915
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|