Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Filed |