|
06/08/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|