Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Filed |