Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/14/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Filed |