Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022