Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | Filed |