Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Filed |