Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022