House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 11 587
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (327802)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (186652, 385312)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|