Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 453
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 453
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|