Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022