Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (266094)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|