Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 42
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 675045 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 432463 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 542835 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 210549 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 783567 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 798685 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 109655 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 630677 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 644973 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (108164, 216020, 396684, 867774)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (421548, 582390) 520
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
CS by Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|