Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Filed |