Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Filed |