Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Education; Appropriations; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | Filed |