Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1846 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022